There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the White Mountain Apache Tribe Water Rights Quantification Act of 2010 to clarify the use of amounts in the WMAT Settlement Fund.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
01/10/2018 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 239 - 173 (Roll no. 11).
12/06/2017 Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-441.
05/08/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/21/2017 Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-7.
01/12/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
01/11/2018 Senate Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
01/10/2018-6:10pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/10/2018-6:10pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 239 - 173 (Roll no. 11).
01/10/2018-5:40pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
01/10/2018-4:46pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 140.
01/10/2018-4:45pm House Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-54 shall be considered as adopted.
01/10/2018-4:44pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 681. (consideration: CR H114-125; text: CR H114)
01/10/2018-4:42pm House Rule H. Res. 681 passed House.
01/09/2018-7:01pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 681 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-54 shall be considered as adopted
12/06/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 326.
12/06/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-441.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/08/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/08/2017 House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/08/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/07/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/02/2017 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
05/16/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/11/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/11/2017-2:03pm House Received in the House.
05/09/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
05/08/2017 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2814; text as passed Senate: CR S2814)
03/21/2017 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 20.
03/21/2017 Senate Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-7.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
02/08/2017 Senate Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
01/12/2017 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs01/12/2017 Referred to
03/21/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-7
House Natural Resources05/11/2017 Referred to
11/08/2017 Markup by
12/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-441
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans05/16/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Hearings by
11/08/2017 Discharged from

Related Bills (4)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Arizona
  • Government trust funds
  • Indian claims
  • Indian lands and resources rights
  • Rural conditions and development
  • Water resources funding
  • Water use and supply

Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.140. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/10/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the White Mountain Apache Tribe Water Rights Quantification Act of 2010 to specify that settlement funds may be used for the planning, design, and construction of the tribe's rural water system in Arizona.

(Sec. 2) The bill amends the Act of August 9, 1955, commonly known as the Long-Term Leasing Act, to allow the Ohkay Owingeh pueblo and the pueblo of Santa Clara in New Mexico to lease their restricted fee tribal land (land that is owned by a tribe and has restrictions against alienation and taxation) for up to 99 years. Under current law, they may lease the lands for up to 25 years.

(Sec. 3) The bill amends the National Labor Relations Act (NLRA) to exclude Native American tribes and tribal enterprises and institutions on tribal land from requirements for employers under the NLRA. (Currently under the NLRA, employers may not engage in unfair labor practices and must allow employees to form unions, engage in collective bargaining, and take collective action.)