There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

21st Century Conservation Service Corps Act

Short Titles as Introduced

21st Century Conservation Service Corps Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Lands Corps Act of 1993 to establish the 21st Century Conservation Service Corps to place youth and veterans in national service positions to conserve, restore, and enhance the great outdoors of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/06/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-420.
12/04/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/21/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
12/06/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-420.
Action By: Senate
12/04/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 711.
Action By: Senate
12/04/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/02/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/19/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-417.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
06/21/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/21/2017 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
12/04/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-420
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks07/19/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1403. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/21/2017)

21st Century Conservation Service Corps Act of 2017

This bill amends the Public Lands Corps Act of 1993 to replace provisions that established the Public Lands Corps with provisions establishing the 21st Century Conservation Service Corps (21CSC) to:

  • engage youth and veterans in civilian national service positions to conserve, rebuild, and enhance the natural resources, infrastructure, and recreation assets of the United States;
  • increase public access to, and use of, public and tribal land and water, infrastructure, and natural, cultural, and historical resources, while spurring economic development and outdoor recreation and addressing backlogged maintenance on public land;
  • conserve, restore, and enhance such resources by carrying out high-quality, cost-effective projects;
  • ensure that the activities and expertise of corpsmembers will be accessible to any public, nonprofit, or tribal entity responsible for the stewardship of land and water in coordination with the land or water owner;
  • place youth and veterans in civilian national service positions to protect, restore, and enhance U.S. natural resources, infrastructure, and recreation assets in a cost-effective manner without undue duplication or overlap of federal agency activities or programs; and
  • channel widespread interest among youth and veterans in serving in such positions to help conserve, restore, and enhance public and tribal land and water, infrastructure, and natural, cultural, and historical resources and to develop the next generation of outdoor stewards, entrepreneurs, recreationists, and sportsmen.

The 21CSC shall be implemented jointly by the participating entities, which shall include the Corporation for National and Community Service, the Office of the Assistant Secretary of the Army for Civil Works, the Federal Emergency Management Agency, and the Departments of Interior, Agriculture, Transportation, Labor, Energy, Defense, Veterans Affairs, Commerce, Education, and Housing and Urban Development. Such entities shall: (1) establish a process for an organization to become a 21CSC organization, and (2) support 21CSC projects.

A 21CSC organization shall provide to each youth or veteran corpsmember a wage, stipend, living allowance, and/or an educational credit, as well as skills development, credentials, and education, for participation in a 21CSC project that involves:

  • specified conservation and restoration projects;
  • the support, development, and enhancement of outdoor recreation or urban green space;
  • service that is primarily indoors with a clear benefit for natural, cultural, or historic resources or treasures; or
  • a project on private land or water having a direct or recognized public or environmental benefit or the funding of which originated from a governmental entity.

The bill sets forth provisions governing 21CSC conservation centers and program support, the provision of resource assistants, and Corpsmember eligibility for a noncompetitive hiring status and national service educational awards.

A participating entity may offer to enter into a cooperative agreement with a tribal agency or a 21CSC organization to establish and administer the Indian Youth 21st Century Conservation Service Corps, which shall carry out 21CSC projects on tribal land or water.