Committees: S.141 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/12/2017 Referred to
01/24/2017 Markup by
03/30/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-21
House Science, Space, and Technology05/03/2017 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
01/03/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1129
House Armed Services05/03/2017 Referred to
01/03/2019 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Strategic Forces05/23/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/03/2017 Referred to
01/03/2019 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs05/03/2017 Referred to
01/03/2019 Discharged from
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)05/03/2017 Referred to
01/03/2019 Discharged from