There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Center for Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Ted Stevens Olympic and Amateur Sports Act to expand the purposes of the corporation, to designate the United States Center for Safe Sport, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/22/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
06/29/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
06/22/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/22/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/28/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/29/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/29/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/10/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/13/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/22/2017 Referred to
06/29/2017 Markup by

As of 10/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.1426 - United States Center for Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1426. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/22/2017)

United States Center for Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Ted Stevens Olympic and Amateur Sports Act to include among the purposes of the U.S. Olympic Committee to promote a safe environment in sports that is free from abuse, including emotional, physical, and sexual abuse, of any amateur athlete.

The bill designates the United States Center for Safe Sport, which shall:

  • serve as the independent national safe sport organization for the United States;
  • exercise jurisdiction over the committee, each national governing body, and each paralympic sports organization with regard to safeguarding amateur athletes against abuse in sports;
  • maintain an office for education and outreach that shall develop training, oversight practices, policies, and procedures to prevent the abuse of amateur athletes;
  • ensure that such policies and procedures require that all such bodies and organizations follow the center's policies and procedures;
  • maintain an office for response and resolution that shall establish mechanisms that allow for the reporting, investigation, and adjudication of alleged sexual abuse in violation of the center's policies and procedures; and
  • ensure that such mechanisms provide fair notice and an opportunity to be heard and protect the privacy and safety of complainants.

The center may utilize a neutral arbitration body and develop policies and procedures to resolve allegations of sexual abuse within its jurisdiction.

The center shall: (1) develop training, oversight practices, policies, and procedures for implementation by such body or organization to prevent abuse of any amateur athlete; (2) keep correct and complete records of account; and (3) report annually to Congress.

The center, and each national governing body and paralympic sports organization, shall not be liable for damages in any civil action for defamation, libel, slander, or damage to reputation arising from the execution of its responsibilities or functions.