There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/25/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-234.
06/27/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
04/25/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
Action By: Senate
04/25/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-234.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/08/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
02/14/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
06/27/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/27/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/26/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 12/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/27/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-234
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks02/14/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1446. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/27/2017)

This bill amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to reauthorize for FY2018-FY2024 the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation Fund Grant Program.