There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

SHUSH Act
Silencers Help Us Save Hearing Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide that silencers be treated the same as firearms accessories.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/29/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/29/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (9)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/29/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/27/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/27/2017
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/13/2017
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/27/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/27/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 09/27/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 09/27/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 10/18/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance06/29/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1505. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/29/2017)

Silencers Help Us Save Hearing Act or the SHUSH Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code: (1) to remove silencers from the list of firearms subject to regulation under the National Firearms Act (NFA), and (2) to specify that a person who lawfully acquires or possesses a silencer under provisions of the federal criminal code meets the registration and licensing requirements of the NFA.

Additionally, the bill amends the federal criminal code:

  • to preempt state or local laws that tax or regulate firearm silencers,
  • to exclude a muffler or silencer from the list of firearms subject to regulation,
  • to eliminate mandatory minimum prison terms for a crime of violence or drug trafficking offense in which a defendant uses or carries a firearm equipped with a silencer, and
  • to permit active and retired law enforcement officers to carry a concealed silencer.