There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill
  • Military Construction Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Military Construction Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original bill to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2018 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/10/2017Committee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator McCain. With written report No. 115-125. Additional views filed.
07/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date
03/22/2018Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S1886-1892, S1892-1931)
Action By: Senate
01/18/2018Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S270)
Action By: Senate
12/19/2017Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S8073)
Action By: Senate
11/29/2017Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7367-7393)
Action By: Senate
11/28/2017Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7351-7355)
Action By: Senate
09/27/2017Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S6159-6175)
Action By: Senate
09/26/2017Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S6097-6121; S6122-6127)
Action By: Senate
09/25/2017Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S5881)
Action By: Senate
07/10/2017Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 165.
Action By: Senate
07/10/2017Committee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator McCain. With written report No. 115-125. Additional views filed.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services07/10/2017 Reported original measure S. Rept. 115-125

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (95)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1519. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/10/2017)

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018

This bill authorizes FY2018 appropriations and sets forth policies regarding the military activities of the Department of Defense (DOD), military construction, and the defense activities of the Department of Energy (DOE). The bill authorizes appropriations, but does not provide budget authority for discretionary programs, which is included in subsequent appropriations legislation.

The bill authorizes appropriations to DOD for Procurement; Research, Development, Test, and Evaluation; Operation and Maintenance; the Revolving and Working Capital Funds; the Joint Urgent Operational Needs Fund; Chemical Agents and Munitions Destruction; Defense-Wide Drug Interdiction and Counter-Drug Activities; the Defense Inspector General; the Defense Health Program; and Overseas Contingency Operations.

The bill also authorizes the FY2018 personnel strengths for active duty and reserve forces and sets forth policies regarding military personnel, compensation and other personnel benefits, health care, acquisition policy and management, DOD organization and management, civilian personnel matters, navy vessels and shipyards, DOE national security programs, and matters relating to foreign nations.

Military Construction Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018

The bill authorizes appropriations and sets forth policies regarding military construction for the Army, Navy, Air Force, defense agencies, the North Atlantic Treaty Organization Security Investment Program, and Guard and Reserve Forces facilities. The bill also authorizes appropriations for base realignment and closure activities.