There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Modernizing Recreational Fisheries Management Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Modernizing Recreational Fisheries Management Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Modernizing Recreational Fisheries Management Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Modernizing Recreational Fisheries Management Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Modernizing Recreational Fisheries Management Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand recreational fishing opportunities through enhanced marine fishery conservation and management, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-405. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 350 - 11 (Roll no. 444).(text: CR H10306-10308)
12/17/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-264.
07/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-405. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2018-7:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2018-7:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 350 - 11 (Roll no. 444). (text: CR H10306-10308)
12/19/2018-7:45pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10319)
12/19/2018-5:27pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Graves (LA) objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/19/2018-5:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1520.
12/19/2018-5:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10306-10309)
12/19/2018-5:17pmHouseMr. Graves (LA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/19/2018-3:25pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2018-2:12pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/18/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.4115 Amendment SA 4115 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.4115 Amendment SA 4115 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7638) In the nature of a substitute.
12/17/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7636-7639; text as reported in Senate: CR S7636-7638)
06/05/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 441.
06/05/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-264.
02/28/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/10/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/10/2017 Referred to
02/28/2018 Markup by
06/05/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-264

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1520. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-405 (12/31/2018)

Modernizing Recreational Fisheries Management Act of 2018

(Sec. 3) This bill defines "mixed-use fishery" to mean a federal fishery in which two or more of the following occur: (1) recreational fishing, (2) charter fishing, or (3) commercial fishing.

TITLE I--CONSERVATION AND MANAGEMENT

(Sec. 101) The Government Accountability Office must conduct a study and submit to Congress a report on mixed-use fisheries in the South Atlantic and Gulf of Mexico.

(Sec. 102) The bill authorizes a regional fishery management council to use management measures in developing a plan or proposed regulations for a recreational fishery or the recreational component of a mixed-use fishery.

(Sec. 103) The Ocean Studies Board of the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine must complete a study on the use of limited access privilege programs to harvest fish in mixed-use fisheries, including an assessment of the social, economic, and ecological effects of the program on businesses, coastal communities, and the environment.

TITLE II--RECREATION FISHERY INFORMATION, RESEARCH, AND DEVELOPMENT

(Sec. 201) The Department of Commerce must develop a report on facilitating greater incorporation of data, analysis, stock assessments, and surveys from state agencies and nongovernmental sources into fisheries management decisions.

(Sec. 202) Commerce must also establish partnerships with states and make grants to improve recreational fisheries data collection.