There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Oregon Wildlands Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Oregon Wildlands Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate certain land administered by the Bureau of Land Management and the Forest Service in the State of Oregon as wilderness and national recreation areas and to make additional wild and scenic river designations in the State of Oregon, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/19/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-439.
12/06/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/13/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
12/19/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-439.
Action By: Senate
12/06/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 726.
Action By: Senate
12/06/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/02/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/26/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-482.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
07/13/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 07/13/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/13/2017 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
12/06/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-439
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining07/26/2017 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.1548.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1548. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/13/2017)

Oregon Wildlands Act

This bill designates specified Bureau of Land Management land in Oregon as the Rogue Canyon and Molalla National Recreation Areas in Oregon.

The Wild and Scenic Rivers Act is amended to add specified segments to the Rogue River as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.

Segment lengths and other technical corrections are made to segment designations for the Chetco River, Oregon.

The Squaw Creek is renamed as Whychus Creek.

The bill designates specified segments of: (1) Franklin and Wasson Creeks as wild rivers and components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System, and (2) the Molalla River as a recreational river and components of such system.

Specified segments are added to the Elk River, and specified other river segments are designated as components of such system.

Approximately 56,100 acres of specified federal land are added to the Wild Rogue Wilderness, as well as approximately 600 acres of certain potential wilderness administered by the Department of the Interior.

Interior shall manage approximately 4,000 acres of Withdrawal Area to preserve the natural and primitive character of the land for recreational, scenic, and scientific use.

Approximately 30,540 acres of certain Forest Service and BLM land in Oregon are designated as the Devil's Staircase Wilderness and a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.