There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Advocacy Empowerment Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend section 203 of Public Law 94-305 to ensure proper authority for the Office of Advocacy of the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/13/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
07/13/2017 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/20/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/02/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 10/24/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship07/13/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 11/23/2017 no related bill information has been received for S.1558 - Advocacy Empowerment Act of 2017.

Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1558. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/13/2017)

Advocacy Empowerment Act of 2017

This bill revises the duties of the Chief Counsel for Advocacy of the Small Business Administration to include: (1) issuing, modifying, or amending rules governing federal agency compliance with regulatory flexibility analysis requirements; and (2) authorizing an agency to issue such supplemental rules governing such compliance as the Chief Counsel may approve.