There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protecting Girls' Access to Education in Vulnerable Settings Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Girls' Access to Education in Vulnerable Settings Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enhance the transparency, improve the coordination, and intensify the impact of assistance to support access to primary and secondary education for displaced children and persons, including women and girls, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-442.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 5 (Roll no. 490).(text: CR H10547-10548)
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7524; text: CR S7524)
07/26/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/19/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-442.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019SenatePresented to President.
12/21/2018-4:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-4:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 5 (Roll no. 490). (text: CR H10547-10548)
12/21/2018-4:33pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10575-10576)
12/21/2018-11:02amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-11:00amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1580.
12/21/2018-11:00amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10547-10550)
12/21/2018-11:00amHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2018-3:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/13/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2018-1:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7524; text: CR S7524)
07/26/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 530.
07/26/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
07/26/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
07/19/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations07/19/2017 Referred to
07/26/2018 Markup by
07/26/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1580. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/19/2017)

Protecting Girls' Access to Education in Vulnerable Settings Act

This bill urges the consideration of the educational needs of vulnerable women and girls in designing, implementing, and evaluating U.S. foreign assistance policies and programs.

The Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) may advance programs that:

  • provide safe, primary and secondary education for displaced children;
  • build the capacity of institutions in countries hosting displaced people to prevent displaced children from facing educational discrimination; and
  • help increase the access of displaced children, especially girls, to educational, economic, and entrepreneurial opportunities.

The State Department and USAID may:

  • coordinate with multilateral organizations to work with foreign governments to collect relevant data, disaggregated by age and gender, on the ability of displaced people to access education and participate in economic activity; and
  • work with domestic and foreign private sector and civil society organizations to promote safe, primary and secondary education for displaced children.