There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Hizballah International Financing Prevention Amendments Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Hizballah International Financing Prevention Amendments Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Hizballah International Financing Prevention Act of 2015 to impose additional sanctions with respect to Hizballah, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
10/11/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1595 by Unanimous Consent.
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/05/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6375)
10/05/2017Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/20/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1595 by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6880)
09/28/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
09/25/2018-10:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-10:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8872-8876)
09/25/2018-10:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1595.
09/25/2018-10:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8872-8878)
09/25/2018-10:20pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/10/2017-7:42pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/10/2017-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/10/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/05/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375)
10/05/2017SenateS.Amdt.1110 Amendment SA 1110 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/2017SenateS.Amdt.1110 Amendment SA 1110 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S6375) In the nature of a substitute.
10/05/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/05/2017SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/20/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/24/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/24/2017
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/26/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/26/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 07/31/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 08/01/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 08/03/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 09/13/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 09/19/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/19/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 09/19/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 09/19/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 09/26/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/26/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/26/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/27/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/27/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/28/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/28/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/28/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 09/28/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/28/2017
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 09/28/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/03/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/03/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 10/03/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 10/05/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/05/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/05/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/05/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/05/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 10/05/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 10/05/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/05/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 10/05/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 10/16/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 10/16/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/18/2017

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to
10/05/2017 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs10/12/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary10/12/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services10/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1595. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/20/2017)

Hizballah International Financing Prevention Amendments Act of 2017

This bill amends the Hizballah International Financing Prevention Act of 2015 to impose specified sanctions on: (1) foreign persons that knowingly assist in or provide support for fund raising or recruitment activities for Hizballah; (2) agencies of foreign governments that provide Hizballah with financial support, arms, or other assistance; and (3) Hizballah by reason of its narcotics trafficking and significant transnational criminal activities.

The bill prescribes reporting requirements or reporting modifications with respect to: (1) foreign persons that knowingly assist or provide significant financial, material, or technological support for foreign persons assisting Hizballah; (2) financial institutions that are owned or organized under the laws of state sponsors of terrorism; (3) Hizballah's racketeering activities; (4) combating illicit tobacco trafficking networks used by Hizballah and other foreign terrorist organizations to finance their operations; (5) the estimated net worth of senior Hizballah officials and how their funds were acquired and used; and (6) revenue from Hizbollah's global logistics networks and legal measures available to target such networks.