There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements in the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/02/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Isakson without amendment. Without written report.
07/20/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
08/02/2017Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 200.
Action By: Senate
08/02/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Isakson without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/26/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/20/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 07/20/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/24/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/24/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/25/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/25/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/25/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/25/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/26/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/26/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/26/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/26/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/26/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/26/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/26/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/26/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/27/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/27/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/27/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/27/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/31/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 07/31/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 08/01/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/01/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/02/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 08/02/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
08/02/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.