There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements in the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/02/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Isakson without amendment. Without written report.
07/20/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
08/02/2017Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 200.
Action By: Senate
08/02/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Isakson without amendment. Without written report.
07/26/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/20/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 07/20/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 07/20/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/24/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/24/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/25/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/25/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/25/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/25/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/26/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/26/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/26/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/26/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/26/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/26/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/26/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/26/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/27/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/27/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/27/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/27/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/31/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 07/31/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 08/01/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/01/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/02/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 08/02/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
08/02/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1598. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/20/2017)

Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017

This bill revises education and related benefits provided to veterans, service members, dependents, and survivors.

The bill amends the Post-9/11 veterans' educational assistance program to:

  • remove certain time restrictions on program use;
  • increase assistance for reservists, guardsmen, dependents, and surviving spouses and dependents;
  • provide full eligibility for Post-9/11 Purple Heart recipients and certain reservists and guardsmen;
  • provide an extra academic years' worth of benefits for STEM (science, technology, engineering, or mathematics) degree candidates;
  • establish a five-year pilot program for high technology courses;
  • restore eligibility for service members whose school closes in the middle of a semester;
  • authorize funding to improve claims processing;
  • permit assistance to be used at certain institutions that are not institutions of higher education; and
  • pro-rate the housing stipend for reservists called to active duty.

The bill authorizes the Edith Nurse Rogers STEM Scholarship to help veterans complete STEM degrees.

The Yellow Ribbon program is extended to Fry Scholarship recipients (surviving dependents of service members who died on active duty) and certain Purple Heart recipients. (The Yellow Ribbon program helps veterans pay for higher education tuition and fee costs not covered by the Post-9/11 program.)

The bill: (1) extends the Advisory Committee on Education, (2) increases survivors' and dependents' educational assistance, and (3) extends funding for state educational program approving agencies.

The bill provides statutory authority for the veterans success of campus program which provides veterans with on-campus educational and vocational counseling.

The Department of Veterans Affairs shall: (1) make a new determination regarding each denied veteran's claim for disability compensation in connection with full-body exposure to mustard gas or Lewisite at specified locations during World War II, and (2) presume such exposure unless there is affirmative evidence otherwise.