There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award the Congressional Gold Medal to Bob Dole, in recognition for his service to the nation as a soldier, legislator, and statesman.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
09/15/2017Became Public Law No: 115-60. (TXT | PDF)
09/15/2017Signed by President.
09/11/2017Presented to President.
09/05/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6638-6639)
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S4804-4805)
08/03/2017Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4804-4806)
07/24/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
09/15/2017Became Public Law No: 115-60. (TXT | PDF)
09/15/2017Signed by President.
09/11/2017SenatePresented to President.
09/05/2017-5:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/05/2017-5:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6638-6639)
09/05/2017-5:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1616.
09/05/2017-5:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6638-6641)
09/05/2017-5:33pmHouseMr. Hultgren moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
08/04/2017-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4804-4805)
08/03/2017SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4804-4806)
07/24/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/24/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/24/2017
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 07/24/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/03/2017
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/03/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/03/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 08/03/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 08/03/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 08/03/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 08/03/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/03/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/03/2017
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/03/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 08/03/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 08/03/2017
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/03/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 08/03/2017
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 08/03/2017
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 08/03/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 08/03/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 08/03/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 08/03/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 08/03/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 08/03/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 08/03/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/03/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 08/03/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/03/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 08/03/2017
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 08/03/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/03/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 08/03/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/03/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 08/03/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 08/03/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 08/03/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 08/03/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 08/03/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 08/03/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 08/03/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 08/03/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/03/2017
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 08/03/2017
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 08/03/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/03/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 08/03/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 08/03/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/03/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/03/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 08/03/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 08/03/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/03/2017
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 08/03/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 08/03/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/03/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 08/03/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 08/03/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/03/2017
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 08/03/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/03/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 08/03/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/03/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 08/03/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 08/03/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 08/03/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/03/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 08/03/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 08/03/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 08/03/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 08/03/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/03/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 08/03/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 08/03/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs07/24/2017 Referred to
08/03/2017 Discharged from
House Financial Services08/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1616. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-60 (09/15/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal to Bob Dole in recognition for his service to the nation as a soldier, legislator, and statesman.