There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Rural Wireless Access Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Rural Wireless Access Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Wireless Access Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Federal Communications Commission to establish a methodology for the collection by the Commission of information about commercial mobile service and commercial mobile data service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/01/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1320; text: CR S1320)
02/07/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-206.
07/24/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
03/09/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/05/2018-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/05/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/01/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1320; text: CR S1320)
02/07/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
02/07/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-206.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
08/02/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
07/24/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/24/2017 Referred to
08/02/2017 Markup by
02/07/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-206
House Energy and Commerce03/05/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology03/09/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1621. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/01/2018)

Rural Wireless Access Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission to establish a consistent methodology for its collection of coverage data about the available speed tiers and performance characteristics of commercial mobile and data service for the Universal Service program or any similar programs.

The methodology must: (1) include standard definitions for different speed tiers, (2) ensure that coverage data is collected in a consistent and robust way, (3) improve the validity and reliability of coverage data, and (4) increase the efficiency of coverage data collection.