There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Marijuana Justice Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for a new rule regarding the application of the Act to marihuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/01/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
08/01/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4669-4670)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/18/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/14/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/19/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 05/10/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/23/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary08/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1689. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/01/2017)

Marijuana Justice Act of 2017

This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act:

  • to remove marijuana and tetrahydrocannabinols from schedule I; and
  • to eliminate criminal penalties for an individual who imports, exports, manufactures, distributes, or possesses with intent to distribute marijuana.

It prohibits and reduces certain federal funds for a state without a statute legalizing marijuana, if the Bureau of Justice Assistance determines that such a state has a disproportionate arrest rate or disproportionate incarceration rate for marijuana offenses.

The bill directs federal courts to expunge convictions for marijuana use or possession.

Finally, it establishes in the Treasury the Community Reinvestment Fund. Amounts in the fund may be used by the Department of Housing and Urban Development to establish a grant program to reinvest in communities most affected by the war on drugs.