There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Combating BDS Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for nonpreemption of measures by State and local governments to divest from entities that engage in commerce-related or investment-related boycott, divestment, or sanctions activities targeting Israel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/17/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/17/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/24/2017
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 01/24/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 01/24/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 01/24/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/24/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 01/24/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/24/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 02/03/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/03/2017
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/16/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/07/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/13/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/13/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/23/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/24/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 04/24/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/18/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/22/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/07/2017
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 06/13/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/20/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/12/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/20/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 07/24/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/25/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/25/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/05/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/28/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/06/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 08/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.170. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/17/2017)

Combating BDS Act of 2017

This bill allows a state or local government to adopt and enforce measures to divest its assets from, prohibit investment of its assets in, or restrict contracting with: (1) an entity that engages in a commerce- or investment-related boycott, divestment, or sanctions activity targeting Israel; or (2) an entity that owns or controls, is owned or controlled by, or is under common ownership or control with such an entity. Such measures are not preempted by federal law. A state or local government that seeks to adopt or enforce such measures shall comply with specified requirements related to notice, timing, and opportunity for comment.

In addition, the bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to prohibit a person from bringing any civil, criminal, or administrative action against a registered investment company based solely upon that company's divestment from securities issued by a person that engages in a commerce- or investment-related boycott, divestment, or sanctions activity targeting Israel.