There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Improving Access to Behavioral Health Information Technology Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Access to Behavioral Health Information Technology Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XI of the Social Security Act to promote testing of incentive payments for behavioral health providers for adoption and use of certified electronic health record technology.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/07/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2528)
05/07/2018Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/09/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/09/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/09/2018-12:16pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/09/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/07/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2528)
05/07/2018SenateS.Amdt.2241 Amendment SA 2241 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/07/2018SenateS.Amdt.2241 Amendment SA 2241 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Whitehouse. (consideration: CR S2528; text: CR S2528) To improve the bill.
05/07/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2528)
05/07/2018SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/19/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 11/28/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance08/03/2017 Referred to
05/07/2018 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce05/09/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/11/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/09/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/11/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1732. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/07/2018)

Improving Access to Behavioral Health Information Technology Act

(Sec. 2) This bill specifies that the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation may test models to provide incentive payments to behavioral health providers for: (1) adopting electronic health records technology, and (2) using that technology to improve the quality and coordination of care.