There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFE Transitional License Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to provide a temporary license for loan originators transitioning between employers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/03/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
08/03/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/27/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/16/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 10/25/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 10/31/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 10/31/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 11/06/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/09/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs08/03/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1753. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/03/2017)

SAFE Transitional License Act

This bill amends the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to temporarily allow loan originators that meet specified requirements to continue to originate loans after moving: (1) from one state to another, or (2) from a depository institution to a non-depository institution.