There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Building America's Trust Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Anti-Border Corruption Reauthorization Act of 2017
  • Kate's Law
  • Passport Revocation Act
  • Protecting Children and America's Homeland Act of 2017
  • Putting the Brakes on Human Smuggling Act
  • Secure Visas Act
  • Stop Dangerous Sanctuary Cities Act
  • Stop Illegal Reentry Act
  • Strong Visa Integrity Secures America Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to strengthen border security, increase resources for enforcement of immigration laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/03/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
09/05/2017Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
Action By: Senate
08/03/2017Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 08/03/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/18/2017
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 10/04/2017

Committees (0)

As of 04/21/2019 text has not been received for S.1757 - Building America's Trust Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (94)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1757. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/03/2017)

Building America's Trust Act

This bill provides for strengthening the barriers along the U.S. land and maritime borders to deter illegal activity, including through U.S. Border Patrol and law enforcement enhancements and personnel increases and National Guard use.

The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall: (1) establish a National Border Security Advisory Committee; (2) submit a southern border threat analysis; (3) implement the Border Security Deployment Program; (4) establish a biometric exit data system; (5) reestablish the Secure Communities program immigration enforcement program; (6) expand criminal alien repatriation programs; and (7) increase visa security at high-risk posts.

The Department of Agriculture may carry out livestock or plant disease prevention/eradication operations.

The bill: (1) makes it a crime to unlawfully hinder immigration, border, and customs controls; (2) requires increases in immigration and law enforcement personnel and district judgeships; (3) authorizes appropriations for specified immigration purposes; and (4) requires electronic passport screening and biometric matching at airports of entry.

Operation Stonegarden is established as a DHS program to provide border security grants.

The Department of Justice shall provide grants for identification of victims of cross-border human smuggling.

The bill revises provisions regarding: (1) apprehension and detention of aliens; (2) nonimmigrant admissions; (3) criminal alien detention and removal; (4) parole entry of aliens; (5) sanctuary jurisdictions; (6) unaccompanied alien children; (7) human trafficking, drug trafficking, criminal organizations, and money laundering; (8) terrorism and national security; (9) gangs; (10) criminal penalties, including penalties for drug trafficking and crimes committed by illegal aliens; (11) human rights violations; (12) visa/document fraud and other grounds for exclusion; (13) student and exchange visitor verification; and (14) use of immigration-related information.

An alien may not be granted any immigrant status or benefits until positive background and security checks are concluded.

The Department of State shall deny or revoke the passport of a person affiliated with a foreign terrorist organization.