There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

SAFER Act of 2017
Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SAFER Act of 2017
Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SAFER Act of 2017
Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

SAFER Act of 2017
Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFER Act of 2017
Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the SAFER Act of 2013, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/08/2018Became Public Law No: 115-107. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2017Presented to President.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10362)
10/23/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6717; text as passed Senate: CR S6717)
09/28/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
01/08/2018Became Public Law No: 115-107. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2017SenatePresented to President.
12/21/2017-5:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2017-5:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10362)
12/21/2017-5:12pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10405)
12/21/2017-2:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mrs. Handel objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/21/2017-2:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1766.
12/21/2017-2:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10362-10364)
12/21/2017-2:30pmHouseMrs. Handel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/25/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/25/2017-12:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/25/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/23/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6717; text as passed Senate: CR S6717)
09/28/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
09/28/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/28/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/06/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5006)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary09/06/2017 Referred to
09/28/2017 Markup by
09/28/2017 Reported by
House Judiciary10/25/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1766. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-107 (01/08/2018)

Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017 or the SAFER Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the DNA Sexual Assault Justice Act of 2004 to require the Department of Justice (DOJ), in providing information about the role of forensic nurses to certain health-related entities, to provide information about the role of both adult and pediatric forensic nurses. DOJ must also provide additional information on the need for pediatric sexual assault nurse examiners in responding to the abuse of both children and adolescents.

(Sec. 3) Additionally, the bill amends the DNA Analysis Backlog Elimination Act of 2000 to reauthorize through FY2022 the requirement for DOJ to allocate a certain percentage of funds under the Debbie Smith DNA Backlog Grant Program for grants to audit backlogged sexual assault kits (i.e., rape kits).

It extends from 2018 to 2023 the sunset date of DOJ's authority to award grants to collect DNA of arrestees and to audit backlogged rape kits.