There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize and amend the National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-307. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018Presented to President.
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9581-9584)
09/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/06/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-336.
09/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-307. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018SenatePresented to President.
11/27/2018-4:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-4:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9581-9584)
11/27/2018-4:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1768.
11/27/2018-4:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9581-9586)
11/27/2018-4:18pmHouseMr. Rohrabacher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/01/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/28/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2018-11:11amHouseReceived in the House.
09/27/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4025 Amendment SA 4025 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4025 Amendment SA 4025 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S6365; text: CR S6364) In the nature of substitute.
09/27/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S6364)
09/27/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6364)
09/06/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 568.
09/06/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-336.
12/13/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/06/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/06/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
09/06/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-336
House Science, Space, and Technology09/28/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources09/28/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources10/01/2018 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/28/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1768. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-307 (12/11/2018)

National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

This bill amends the Earthquake Hazards Reduction Act of 1977 to reauthorize through FY2023, and expand activities under, the National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program to include: (1) gathering information on community resilience (i.e., the ability of a community to prepare for, recover from, and adapt to earthquakes); (2) publishing a systematic set of maps of active faults and folds, liquefaction susceptibility, susceptibility for earthquake-induced landslides, and other seismically induced hazards; and (3) continuing the development of the Advanced National Seismic System, including earthquake early warning capabilities.

(Sec. 2) The bill modifies the Act's findings to include Puerto Rico as vulnerable to the hazards of earthquakes, and adds Oregon and Tennessee to the list of states cited as having major or moderate seismic risk.

(Sec. 3) With respect to earthquake hazard reduction activities, the bill revises or expands the duties of: (1) the Interagency Coordinating Committee on Earthquake Hazards Reduction, (2) the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST), (3) the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), (4) the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS), and (5) the National Science Foundation.

(Sec. 4) The Government Accountability Office shall complete a review of federal earthquake hazard risk reduction efforts.

(Sec. 5) NIST and FEMA must jointly convene a committee of experts to assess and recommend options for improving seismic safety standards.

(Sec. 6) The USGS must submit to Congress a five-year management plan for the continued operation of the Advanced National Seismic System.