There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Trade Accountability Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for congressional review of the imposition of duties and other trade measures by the executive branch, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/20/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/20/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/08/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 03/15/2018
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 04/26/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/04/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance01/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.177. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/20/2017)

Global Trade Accountability Act of 2017

This bill amends the Trade Act of 1974 to require congressional approval of unilateral trade actions. Such actions may take effect without congressional approval for one 90-day period if the President:

  • determines that it is necessary because of a national emergency, because of an imminent threat to health or safety, for the enforcement of criminal laws, or for national security; and
  • submits written notice of the determination to Congress.