There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fair RATES Act
Fair Ratepayer Accountability, Transparency, and Efficiency Standards Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Fair RATES Act
Fair Ratepayer Accountability, Transparency, and Efficiency Standards Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair RATES Act
Fair Ratepayer Accountability, Transparency, and Efficiency Standards Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Power Act to provide that any inaction by the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission that allows a rate change to go into effect shall be treated as an order by the Commission for purposes of rehearing and court review.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6031-6032; text CR S6031-6032)
06/18/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 115-278.
01/23/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
09/05/2018-3:12pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/05/2018-12:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/04/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6031-6032; text CR S6031-6032)
06/18/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 469.
06/18/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 115-278.
03/08/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
10/03/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-318.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
01/23/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/23/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/23/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/23/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/23/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
06/18/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-278
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy10/03/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.186. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/23/2017)

Fair Ratepayer Accountability, Transparency, and Efficiency Standards Act or the Fair RATES Act

This bill amends the Federal Power Act to permit a party to seek a rehearing and subsequent judicial review of any rate change filed by a public utility that takes effect without the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) issuing an order making such change effective. (Public utilities must give FERC and the public a 60-day notice before a proposed rate change can take effect.)