There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Affordable College Textbook Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand the use of open textbooks in order to achieve savings for students.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
09/26/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6136-6137)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 09/26/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 09/26/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/28/2017
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 02/05/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/07/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/26/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1864. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/26/2017)

Affordable College Textbook Act

This bill directs the Department of Education (ED) to make grants to institutions of higher education (IHEs) to support projects that expand the use of open textbooks in order to achieve savings for students while maintaining or improving instruction and student learning outcomes. An open textbook is an educational resource that either resides in the public domain or has been released under an intellectual license that permits its free use, reuse, modification, and sharing with others.