There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (13)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

EGO Act
Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EGO Act
Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

EGO Act
Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

EGO Act
Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act

Short Titles as Introduced

EGO Act
Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 31, United States Code, to prohibit the use of Federal funds for the costs of painting portraits of officers and employees of the Federal Government, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to amend title 31, United States Code, to prohibit the use of Federal funds for the costs of painting portraits of officers and employees of the Federal Government, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the use of Federal funds for the costs of painting portraits of officers and employees of the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/2018Became Public Law No: 115-158. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2018Signed by President.
03/19/2018Presented to President.
03/14/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1738-1739)
03/06/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1418)
09/18/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5810; text: CR S5810)
04/24/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-28.
01/23/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/27/2018Became Public Law No: 115-158. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2018Signed by President.
03/19/2018SenatePresented to President.
03/15/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/14/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1738-1739)
03/07/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
03/06/2018-3:51pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/06/2018-3:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/06/2018-3:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1418)
03/06/2018-3:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 188.
03/06/2018-3:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1418-1419)
03/06/2018-3:46pmHouseMr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/21/2017-11:33amHouseHeld at the desk.
09/21/2017-11:02amHouseReceived in the House.
09/19/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/18/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5810; text: CR S5810)
04/24/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 37.
04/24/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-28.
03/15/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/23/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/23/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/23/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/23/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 03/21/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/24/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 09/19/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/23/2017 Referred to
03/15/2017 Markup by
04/24/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-28

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.188. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-158 (03/27/2018)

Eliminating Government-funded Oil-painting Act or the EGO Act

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the use of funds appropriated or otherwise made available to the federal government to pay for an official portrait of an officer or employee of the federal government, including the President, the Vice President, a Member of Congress, the head of an executive agency, or the head of an office of the legislative branch.