There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Automatic Gunfire Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the possession or transfer of certain firearm accessories, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/14/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
12/06/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
10/04/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6351-6352)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 10/04/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 10/04/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/05/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/05/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/05/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 10/05/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/05/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 10/05/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/05/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/05/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/05/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/19/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 11/08/2017
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 03/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary10/04/2017 Referred to
12/06/2017 Hearings by
03/14/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1916. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/04/2017)

Automatic Gunfire Prevention Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to make it a crime to import, sell, manufacture, transfer, or possess a trigger crank, a bump-fire device, or any part, combination of parts, component, device, attachment, or accessory that is designed or functions to accelerate the rate of fire of a semiautomatic rifle but not convert the semiautomatic rifle into a machine gun.

The bill does not prohibit, with respect to such firearm accessories, the importation or manufacture for, sale or transfer to, or possession by a federal, state, or local government.

A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to 10 years, or both.