There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Alaska Remote Generator Reliability and Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Alaska Remote Generator Reliability and Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prevent catastrophic failure or shutdown of remote diesel power engines due to emission control devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
12/21/2018Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 202 - 171 (Roll no. 494).
12/04/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7277-7278; text of measure as reported: CR S7278; text of measure as passed: CR S7278)
11/26/2018By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-379.
09/18/2018Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018-4:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 202 - 171 (Roll no. 494).
12/21/2018-4:47pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
12/21/2018-11:35amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-11:19amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1934.
12/21/2018-11:19amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
12/21/2018-11:19amHouseMr. Shimkus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/06/2018-2:24pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/06/2018-12:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7277-7278; text of measure as reported: CR S7278; text of measure as passed: CR S7278)
11/26/2018SenateAn errata sheet on written report number No. 115-379 was printed.
11/26/2018SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-379.
09/18/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 576.
09/18/2018SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/18/2018SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/14/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-127.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety
10/05/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 10/05/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works10/05/2017 Referred to
09/18/2018 Markup by
09/18/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-379
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety11/14/2017 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.1934.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1934. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/18/2018)

Alaska Remote Generator Reliability and Protection Act

This bill directs the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to revise certain regulations regarding particulate matter emissions standards for nonemergency stationary diesel engines in remote areas of Alaska. The EPA must report on methods for assisting remote areas of Alaska in meeting specified energy needs.