There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Tribal Law and Order Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Tribal Law and Order Act of 2010 and the Indian Law Enforcement Reform Act to provide for advancements in public safety services to Indian communities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/13/2018Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-433.
10/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
12/13/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 732.
Action By: Senate
12/13/2018Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-433.
02/14/2018Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/25/2017Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-329.
10/05/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 10/05/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 10/05/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/25/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 10/30/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs10/05/2017 Referred to
10/25/2017 Hearings by
02/14/2018 Markup by
12/13/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-433

No related bill information was received for S.1953.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1953. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/05/2017)

Tribal Law and Order Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2017

This bill amends the Indian Law Enforcement Reform Act, the Tribal Law and Order Act of 2010, and other laws to: (1) establish, or reauthorize through FY2022 and revise, various public safety programs and services for Indian communities (e.g., law enforcement, alcohol and substance abuse prevention, and control of illegal narcotics); and (2) modify provisions, and reauthorize through FY2022 various programs, related to Indian youth and juvenile justice.