There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

SBIR and STTR Oversight and Pilot Program Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

SBIR and STTR Oversight and Pilot Program Extension Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Small Business Act to temporarily reauthorize certain pilot programs under the Small Business Innovation Research Program and the Small Business Technology Transfer Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2018By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-450.
03/19/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/16/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
12/20/2018By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-450.
Action By: Senate
03/19/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 349.
Action By: Senate
03/19/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/14/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/16/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 10/16/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship10/16/2017 Referred to
03/14/2018 Markup by
03/19/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-450

No related bill information was received for S.1961.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1961. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/16/2017)

SBIR and STTR Oversight and Pilot Program Extension Act of 2018

This bill amends the Small Business Act to extend through FY2018 pilot programs under the Small Business Innovation Research Program (SBIR) and the Small Business Technology Transfer Program (STTR), specifically:

  • phase flexibility that allows, under specified conditions, the National Institutes of Health (NIH), the Department of Defense, and the Department of Education to each provide a small business award under Phase II (research and development) of the SBIR program for a project whether or not the business was provided an award under Phase I (proof of concept);
  • awards for technology development, testing, evaluation, and commercialization assistance for SBIR and STTR Phase II technologies or to support the progress of research, research and development, and commercialization conducted under SBIR or STTR programs to Phase III (commercialization);
  • the NIH Phase 0 Proof of Concept Partnership to accelerate the creation of small businesses and the commercialization of research innovations from qualifying institutions; and
  • the authority of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to allow federal agencies to use up to 3% of SBIR program funds for administrative, oversight, and contract processing costs.

The SBA shall establish the Regional SBIR State Collaborative Initiative Pilot Program to provide awards to specified regional collaboratives to address the needs of small businesses in order to:

  • be more competitive in the proposal and selection process for SBIR and STTR program awards, and
  • increase technology transfer and commercialization.