There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Dependency and Indemnity Compensation Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to increase the amounts payable by the Department of Veterans Affairs for dependency and indemnity compensation, to modify the requirements for dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain veterans rated totally disabled at the time of death, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/19/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
08/01/2018Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-616.
10/19/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 10/19/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 10/19/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 12/06/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/19/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/11/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/19/2017 Referred to
08/01/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1990. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/19/2017)

Dependency and Indemnity Compensation Improvement Act of 2017

This bill increases monthly rates for veterans' dependency and indemnity compensation payable to surviving spouses through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA).

The VA shall pay to an individual who is eligible for dependency and indemnity compensation predicated on the death of a veteran before January 1, 1993, monthly dependency and indemnity compensation that is the greater of the amount in effect either before or after enactment of this bill.

The bill makes VA dependent and survivor income benefits payable to a surviving spouse who remarries after age 55.