There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

RPM Act of 2017
Recognizing the Protection of Motorsports Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reaffirm that the Environmental Protection Agency may not regulate vehicles used solely for competition, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
11/14/2017Committee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-127.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety
04/26/2017Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-58.
Action By: Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship
01/24/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/01/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/01/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 02/08/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/09/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 02/09/2017
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 02/10/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 02/14/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 02/14/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 02/16/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/17/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/01/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/07/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 04/06/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 04/27/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/10/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/16/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/23/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/24/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/05/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/07/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/12/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/19/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/19/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/22/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/18/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works01/24/2017 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety11/14/2017 Hearings by
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship04/26/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.203. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/24/2017)

Recognizing the Protection of Motorsports Act of 2017 or the RPM Act of 2017

This bill amends the Clean Air Act to allow the modification of a vehicle's air emission controls if the vehicle is used solely for competition.