There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Trickett Wendler, Frank Mongiello, Jordan McLinn, and Matthew Bellina Right to Try Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Trickett Wendler, Frank Mongiello, Jordan McLinn, and Matthew Bellina Right to Try Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Trickett Wendler, Frank Mongiello, Jordan McLinn, and Matthew Bellina Right to Try Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Trickett Wendler Right to Try Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the use of unapproved medical products by patients diagnosed with a terminal illness in accordance with State law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/30/2018Became Public Law No: 115-176. (TXT | PDF)
05/30/2018Signed by President.
05/24/2018Presented to President.
05/22/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 250 - 169 (Roll no. 214).(text: CR H4355-4356)
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2017Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/24/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
05/30/2018Became Public Law No: 115-176. (TXT | PDF)
05/30/2018Signed by President.
05/24/2018SenatePresented to President.
05/22/2018-5:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/2018-5:26pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 250 - 169 (Roll no. 214). (text: CR H4355-4356)
05/22/2018-5:19pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 231 (Roll no. 213).
05/22/2018-4:50pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
05/22/2018-4:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike everything after section 1 and insert a completely new text.
05/22/2018-4:43pmHouseMs. Schakowsky moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (CR H4363)
05/22/2018-4:42pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
05/22/2018-3:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 204.
05/22/2018-3:52pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for consideration of S. 2155 and S. 204 under a closed rule. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5515 under a structured rule and makes an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-70 considered as adopted.
05/22/2018-3:52pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 905. (consideration: CR H4355-4366)
05/21/2018-9:28pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 905 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for consideration of S. 2155 and S. 204 under a closed rule. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5515 under a structured rule and makes an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-70 considered as adopted.
08/11/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
08/04/2017-1:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2017SenateS.Amdt.753 Amendment SA 753 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2017SenateS.Amdt.753 Amendment SA 753 proposed by Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S4788-4789; text: CR S4788-4789) In the nature of a substitute.
08/03/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4788-4789)
08/03/2017SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/24/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 01/24/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/24/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/24/2017
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 01/24/2017
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/07/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 03/15/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/29/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/24/2017 Referred to
08/03/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce08/04/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.204. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-176 (05/30/2018)

Trickett Wendler, Frank Mongiello, Jordan McLinn, and Matthew Bellina Right to Try Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to exempt, from specified requirements and restrictions under that Act and other laws, the provision of certain unapproved, investigational drugs to a terminally ill patient who has exhausted approved treatment options and is unable to participate in a clinical trial involving the drugs. The manufacturer or sponsor of an eligible investigational drug must report annually to the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) on any use of the drug in accordance with these provisions. The FDA shall post an annual summary report of such use on its website.

The bill limits the liability of a sponsor, manufacturer, prescriber, or dispenser that provides, or declines to provide, an eligible investigational drug to an eligible patient in accordance with the bill.