There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 621 Kansas Avenue in Atchison, Kansas, as the "Amelia Earhart Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-162. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2018Signed by President.
03/22/2018Presented to President.
03/20/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H1718)
03/07/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S1525-1527; text: CR S1527)
02/15/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
10/31/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
04/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-162. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2018Signed by President.
03/22/2018SenatePresented to President.
03/20/2018-3:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/20/2018-3:46pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1718)
03/20/2018-3:46pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1718)
03/20/2018-3:46pmHouseMr. Issa asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
03/08/2018-1:55pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/08/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/08/2018-12:25pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/07/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1525-1527; text: CR S1527)
02/15/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 314.
02/15/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
02/14/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
10/31/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 10/31/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/31/2017 Referred to
02/14/2018 Markup by
02/15/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2040. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-162 (04/03/2018)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 621 Kansas Avenue in Atchison, Kansas, as the "Amelia Earhart Post Office Building."