There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2017

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Federal Register Printing Savings Act of 2017
  • Missing Americans Alert Program Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill
  • Federal Register Printing Savings Act of 2017
  • Missing Americans Alert Program Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Missing Americans Alert Program Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994, to reauthorize the Missing Alzheimer's Disease Patient Alert Program, and to promote initiatives that will reduce the risk of injury and death relating to the wandering characteristics of some children with autism.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
01/18/2018By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-200.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(text: CR S8274-8276)
12/01/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment. Without written report.
11/02/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/18/2018SenateBy Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-200.
12/22/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/22/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/22/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/22/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/22/2017-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S8274-8276)
12/21/2017SenateS.Amdt.1865 Amendment SA 1865 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/2017SenateS.Amdt.1865 Amendment SA 1865 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. To make technical corrections.
12/21/2017SenateThe committee amendment agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8271-8276)
12/01/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 270.
12/01/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment. Without written report.
11/16/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/02/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7002-7003)

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary11/02/2017 Referred to
11/16/2017 Markup by
12/01/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-200
House Judiciary12/22/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce12/22/2017 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform12/22/2017 Referred to
Committee on House Administration12/22/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2070. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/21/2017)

Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2017

TITLE I--MISSING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE PATIENT ALERT PROGRAM REAUTHORIZATION

Missing Americans Alert Program Act of 2017

(Sec. 102) This bill amends the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994 to revise and rename the Missing Alzheimer's Disease Patient Alert Program as the Missing Americans Alert Program and to reauthorize it through FY2022.

It directs the Department of Justice's (DOJ's) Bureau of Justice Assistance (BJA) to award competitive grants to health care, law enforcement, or public safety agencies, and nonprofit organizations, to develop or operate locally based proactive programs to prevent wandering and locate missing individuals with dementia or children with developmental disabilities. The BJA must give preference to law enforcement or public safety agencies partnering with nonprofit organizations that use person-centered plans and are directly linked to individuals, and families of individuals, with dementia or developmental disabilities.

Additionally, it directs the BJA to award grants to health care, law enforcement, or public safety agencies to develop tracking technology programs to locate missing individuals with dementia or children with developmental disabilities.

The bill subjects grants under the Missing Americans Program to accountability provisions. DOJ's Office of Inspector General must conduct annual audits of selected grant recipients. The bill prohibits grants to nonprofit organizations that hold money in an offshore account to avoid tax liability. It also limits the use of grants under this bill for conferences that use more than $20,000 in DOJ funds.

DOJ must identify and report on duplicative grant awards. DOJ must also report annually to Congress certain information regarding the Missing Americans Alert Program.

TITLE II--EDUCATION AND OUTREACH

(Sec. 201) The bill amends the Missing Children's Assistance Act to specify that, with respect to training and technical assistance provided by the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children, cases involving missing and exploited children include cases involving children with developmental disabilities such as autism.

TITLE III--PRIVACY PROTECTIONS

(Sec. 302) DOJ must establish and certain grant recipients must comply with standards and best practices related to the use of tracking technology to locate missing individuals with dementia or developmental disabilities.

The bill prohibits the use of data from tracking devices to create a federal database. It also prohibits construing this bill to require a parent or guardian to use a tracking device.

TITLE IV--OFFSET BY RESTRICTING DISTRIBUTION OF FREE PRINTED COPIES OF FEDERAL REGISTER

Federal Register Printing Savings Act of 2017

(Sec. 402) The bill bars the Government Publishing Office from furnishing a printed copy of the Federal Register without charge to any Member of Congress or any other office of the United States during a year unless:

  • the Member or office requests a printed copy of a specific issue of the Federal Register; or
  • during that year or the previous year, the Member or office requested a subscription to printed copies of the Federal Register for that year.