There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Short Titles as Introduced

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize the expansion of activities related to Alzheimer's disease, cognitive decline, and brain health under the Alzheimer's Disease and Healthy Aging Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/29/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
12/13/2018-3:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/13/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2018-1:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/12/2018SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7526-7527)
12/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4104 Amendment SA 4104 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4104 Amendment SA 4104 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S7527; text: CR S7527) To clarify provisions relating to waivers.
12/12/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7526-7527)
11/29/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 694.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
11/06/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7017-7019)

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 11/06/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 11/06/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 11/06/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/30/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/11/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/11/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/13/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/06/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/06/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/14/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 02/27/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/05/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 03/05/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/05/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/05/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/12/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/12/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 03/13/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/15/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/19/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/19/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 04/19/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/25/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/07/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/08/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/14/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/14/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/16/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/16/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/17/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 05/17/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 05/23/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/04/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/06/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/18/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/19/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/19/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/19/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/19/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/20/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/26/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/26/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/28/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/28/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/10/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/24/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/20/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 08/21/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/27/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/04/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/12/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/24/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/13/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/26/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 11/29/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/10/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions11/06/2017 Referred to
11/29/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2076. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/06/2017)

Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act or the BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to award cooperative agreements: (1) for the establishment or support of national or regional centers of excellence in public health practice in Alzheimer's disease; (2) to state public health departments, Native American tribes, and other entities to promote cognitive functioning, address cognitive impairment and unique aspects of Alzheimer's disease, and help meet the needs of caregivers; (3) for analysis and public reporting of data on the state and national levels regarding cognitive decline, caregiving, and health disparities, and monitoring of objectives on dementia and caregiving in the Department of Health and Human Services' Healthy People 2020 report.