There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Short Titles as Introduced

BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act
Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize the expansion of activities related to Alzheimer's disease, cognitive decline, and brain health under the Alzheimer's Disease and Healthy Aging Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-406. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 3 (Roll no. 438).(text: CR H10282-10283)
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/29/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-406. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2018-7:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2018-7:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 3 (Roll no. 438). (text: CR H10282-10283)
12/19/2018-7:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10314-10315)
12/19/2018-3:54pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/19/2018-3:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2076.
12/19/2018-3:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10282-10286)
12/19/2018-3:31pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2018-3:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/13/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2018-1:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/12/2018SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7526-7527)
12/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4104 Amendment SA 4104 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4104 Amendment SA 4104 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S7527; text: CR S7527) To clarify provisions relating to waivers.
12/12/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7526-7527)
11/29/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 694.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/06/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7017-7019)

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 11/06/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 11/06/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 11/06/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/30/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/11/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/11/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/13/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/06/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/06/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/14/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 02/27/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/05/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 03/05/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/05/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/05/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/12/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/12/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 03/13/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/15/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/19/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/19/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 04/19/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/25/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/07/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/08/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/14/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/14/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/16/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/16/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/17/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 05/17/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 05/23/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/04/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/06/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/18/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/19/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/19/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/19/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/19/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/20/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/26/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/26/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/28/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/28/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/10/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/24/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/20/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 08/21/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/27/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/04/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/12/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/24/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/13/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/26/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 11/29/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/10/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions11/06/2017 Referred to
11/29/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2076. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-406 (12/31/2018)

Building Our Largest Dementia Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act or the BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize through FY2024 and revise grant programs regarding Alzheimer's disease and related dementias. Among other changes, the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must support: (1) the establishment of regional centers that address Alzheimer's disease and related dementias, such as through public awareness campaigns; and (2) data collection on the incidence and prevalence of such conditions.

(Sec. 3) HHS must also award cooperative agreements to health departments for the purpose of addressing Alzheimer's disease and related dementias, such as through reducing cognitive decline and helping caregivers.