There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

End Banking for Human Traffickers Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the role of the financial industry in combating human trafficking.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/09/2018Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-158.
11/06/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 11/06/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/07/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/07/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/07/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 11/07/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 11/08/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 06/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/06/2017 Referred to
01/09/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2080. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/06/2017)

End Banking for Human Traffickers Act of 2017

This bill revises the duties of the Department of the Treasury's Office of Terrorism and Financial Intelligence to include combating illicit financing relating to human trafficking.

The bill amends the Trafficking Victims Protection Act of 2000 to direct the Interagency Task Force to Monitor and Combat Trafficking to report on efforts to eliminate money laundering relating to human trafficking.

The Federal Financial Institutions Examinations Council must review procedures relating to the detection and deterrence of human trafficking-related financial transactions.