There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to modernize and strengthen the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States to more effectively guard against the risk to the national security of the United States posed by certain types of foreign investment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/22/2018Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Crapo with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
11/08/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
05/22/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 426.
Action By: Senate
05/22/2018Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Crapo with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
05/22/2018Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/30/2018Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-161.
01/25/2018Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-160.
01/18/2018Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
11/08/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7111-7118)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to
01/30/2018 Hearings by
05/22/2018 Markup by
05/22/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2098. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/08/2017)

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Defense Production Act of 1950 to expand the scope of "covered transaction" subject to the review of the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States (CFIUS). CFIUS analyzes the national security implications of foreign investment in the United States.

A covered transaction includes:

  • any merger, acquisition, or takeover that could result in foreign control of any U.S. business,
  • the purchase or lease of real estate located in the United States that is in close proximity to a U.S. military installation or to another U.S. government facility or property that is sensitive for reasons relating to national security,
  • other investment in a U.S. critical technology company or U.S. critical infrastructure company,
  • any change in a foreign investor's rights that results in foreign control of a U.S. business,
  • the contribution of intellectual property to a foreign person, or
  • any other transaction, transfer, agreement, or arrangement designed to evade or circumvent the authority of CFIUS.

The bill revises other provisions relating to CFIUS, including the length of its review period, special hiring authority and funding, and authority to mandate reviews or take unilateral action.