There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

USS Indianapolis Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

USS Indianapolis Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the crew of the USS Indianapolis, in recognition of their perseverance, bravery, and service to the United States.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
12/12/2018Committee on Financial Services discharged.
08/01/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2018Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/08/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
12/12/2018-4:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2018-4:25pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10157)
12/12/2018-4:24pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10157)
12/12/2018HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
12/12/2018-4:24pmHouseMr. Barr asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
08/03/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
08/03/2018-10:04amHouseReceived in the House.
08/02/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5560-5561)
08/01/2018SenateS.Amdt.3688 Amendment SA 3688 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2018SenateS.Amdt.3688 Amendment SA 3688 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Donnelly. (consideration: CR S5560; text: CR S5560) To improve the bill.
08/01/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5560-5561)
08/01/2018SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/08/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 11/08/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 11/29/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 12/05/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/05/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/11/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 02/06/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/06/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 02/13/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 02/26/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 03/05/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/23/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/25/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/17/2018
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/17/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/17/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/17/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/17/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/17/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/17/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/17/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/17/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/17/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/24/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 05/24/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/24/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 05/24/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/24/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/24/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/24/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/24/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/07/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/07/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/07/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/07/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/07/2018
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/07/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/07/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 06/14/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/14/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/14/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/14/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/18/2018
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/18/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/18/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/18/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/19/2018
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/10/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/10/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/10/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/10/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/10/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/10/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 07/10/2018
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/11/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/11/2018
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 07/12/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/17/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/17/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/17/2018
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/17/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/18/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 07/18/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/18/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 07/18/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 07/19/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/19/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/19/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/24/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/24/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/24/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to
08/01/2018 Discharged from
House Financial Services08/03/2018 Referred to
12/12/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.