There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Provider Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Under Secretary of Health to report major adverse personnel actions involving certain health care employees to the National Practitioner Data Bank and to applicable State licensing boards, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/09/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
11/09/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 11/14/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/12/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/30/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/09/2017 Referred to

As of 10/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.2107 - Department of Veterans Affairs Provider Accountability Act.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2107. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/09/2017)

Department of Veterans Affairs Provider Accountability Act

This bill provides that when the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) brings a major adverse action against certain Veterans Health Administration medical employees the VA shall transmit to the National Practitioner Data Bank and the applicable state licensing board the employee's name and the reason for such action.

The VA may not enter into a settlement agreement regarding a claim by a VA employee under which it would be required to conceal a serious medical error or purge a negative record from an employee's personnel file. Such provision shall not apply to a negative record if the VA Office of Accountability and Whistleblower Protection and the Office of Special Counsel jointly certify that the negative record is not legitimate.