There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Military and Veterans Education Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to count revenues from military and veteran education programs toward the limit on Federal revenues that certain proprietary institutions of higher education are allowed to receive for purposes of section 487 of the Higher Education Act of 1965, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/09/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
11/09/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 11/09/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 11/09/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 11/09/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 12/05/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/06/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/18/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/13/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/04/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 07/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions11/09/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2109. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/09/2017)

Military and Veterans Education Protection Act

This bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to revise a requirement, commonly known as the 90/10 rule, which directs proprietary (for profit) institutions of higher education to derive at least 10% of their revenue from nonfederal financial aid sources, or risk becoming ineligible for title IV funding. Currently the rule allows federal educational assistance for military personnel and veterans to count toward the 10%. This bill defines federal educational assistance to include federal educational assistance for military personnel and veterans. Thus, the bill prohibits proprietary institutions from counting federal educational assistance for military personnel and veterans as nonfederal funding sources.