There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Newborn Emergency Treatment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish medically necessary transportation for newborn children of certain women veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/15/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
11/15/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/20/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/28/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/17/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/17/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/15/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2131.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.