There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Fix NICS Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enforce current law regarding the National Instant Criminal Background Check System.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/15/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
03/14/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/06/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/15/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7163-7265)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 11/15/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/16/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/16/2017
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/16/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 11/16/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/16/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/16/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/28/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 11/28/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 11/28/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 11/28/2017
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/28/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/28/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/28/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 11/28/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/29/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 11/29/2017
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 12/05/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/05/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/12/2017
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 12/12/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/19/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 12/19/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 12/19/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/19/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 12/21/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/21/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 12/21/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/21/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/26/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/26/2018
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/26/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/26/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/26/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/26/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/27/2018
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/27/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/27/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 02/27/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 02/28/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/28/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 02/28/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/28/2018
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/06/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/06/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/06/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/06/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/07/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/07/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/08/2018
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/08/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/08/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/08/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/08/2018
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/08/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/12/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/12/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 03/12/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/12/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 03/12/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/12/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/13/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/14/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/14/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/15/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/19/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 03/20/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/20/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/20/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/20/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/21/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary11/15/2017 Referred to
03/14/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2135. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/15/2017)

Fix NICS Act of 2017

This bill amends the Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act to require each federal agency and department, including a federal court, to:

  • certify whether it has provided to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS) disqualifying records of persons prohibited from receiving or possessing a firearm, and
  • establish and substantially comply with an implementation plan to maximize record submissions and verify their accuracy.

The bill amends the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to:

  • direct the Department of Justice (DOJ) to establish a state implementation plan, including benchmarks, to maximize the automation and submission of mental health and criminal history records to the NICS;
  • waive the grant match requirement under the National Criminal History Improvement Program (NCHIP) for a state that complies with its implementation plan;
  • reauthorize through FY2022 the NICS Act Record Improvement Program (NARIP);
  • establish, as a priority area for NARIP grant funding, a domestic abuse and violence prevention initiative; and
  • create a funding preference under the NARIP program for states that establish an implementation plan and use grant funds to upload felony conviction and domestic violence records.

It amends the Crime Identification Technology Act of 1998 to reauthorize through FY2022 the NCHIP program. If a state complies with its implementation plan, then the federal share of an NCHIP grant may exceed 90% of program costs.