There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission to issue an order continuing a stay of a hydroelectric license for the Mahoney Lake hydroelectric project in the State of Alaska, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4809; text: CR S4809)
05/24/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-77.
01/24/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/03/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/03/2018-11:37amHouseReceived in the House.
06/29/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4809; text: CR S4809)
05/24/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 96.
05/24/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-77.
03/30/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/24/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 01/24/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/24/2017 Referred to
03/30/2017 Markup by
05/24/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-77
House Energy and Commerce07/03/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.215. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/28/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill requires the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC), upon request, to issue a stay of the statutory deadline by which construction must commence on the Mahoney Lake Hydroelectric Project located in Ketchikan Gateway Borough, Alaska. (The City of Saxman, Alaska, was granted a construction license for the Mahoney Lake Hydroelectric Project on January 22, 1998.)

Additionally, upon request, FERC must reinstate the construction license and make it effective as of the date the stay is lifted.

FERC may reinstate the construction license if it is expired.

Subject to certain conditions, FERC may extend for up to six years the statutory deadline by which construction must commence on the project.