There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Amy, Vicky, and Andy Child Pornography Victim Assistance Act of 2018

Other Short Titles

Amy, Vicky, and Andy Child Pornography Victim Assistance Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Amy, Vicky, and Andy Child Pornography Victim Assistance Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Amy, Vicky, and Andy Child Pornography Victim Assistance Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Amy, Vicky, and Andy Child Pornography Victim Assistance Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Amy, Vicky, and Andy Child Pornography Victim Assistance Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to provide for assistance for victims of child pornography, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-299.
12/07/2018Signed by President.
11/26/2018Presented to President.
11/15/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2152 by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/28/2018Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
01/23/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S471-475; text: CR S473-475)
01/16/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with amendments. Without written report.
11/16/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
12/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-299.
12/07/2018Signed by President.
11/26/2018SenatePresented to President.
11/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/15/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2152 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7065-7066)
10/01/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
09/28/2018-12:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:33pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
09/28/2018-12:33pmHouseH.Amdt.974 On agreeing to the Marino amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:33pmHouseH.Amdt.974 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Marino. (consideration: CR H9371-9373; text: CR H9371-9373)
09/28/2018-12:32pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9369-9373; text of measure as introduced: CR H9369-9371)
09/28/2018-12:32pmHouseMr. Marino asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
01/25/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/25/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/25/2018-4:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/24/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/23/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S471-475; text: CR S473-475)
01/16/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 293.
01/16/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with amendments. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/11/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/16/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary11/16/2017 Referred to
01/11/2018 Markup by
01/16/2018 Reported by
House Judiciary01/25/2018 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/25/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2152. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (01/23/2018)

Amy, Vicky, and Andy Child Pornography Victim Assistance Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the federal criminal code to modify procedures for determining the amount of mandatory restitution in child pornography cases.

If a defendant is convicted of trafficking in child pornography, then the court must order mandatory restitution in an amount which is between $3,000 and 1% of the full amount of the victim's losses. The full amount of the victim's losses includes costs incurred as a proximate result of all trafficking in child pornography offenses involving the same victim.

(Sec. 4) If a defendant is convicted of child pornography production, then a victim of the offense may elect to receive a one-time payment in the amount of $35,000 (adjusted for inflation) from a Child Pornography Victims Reserve, subject to limitations.

(Sec. 5) The bill amends the Victims of Crime Act of 1984 to establish the Child Pornography Victims Reserve within the Crime Victims Fund. Courts must impose additional assessments on persons convicted of child pornography offenses, and the additional assessments must be deposited into the Child Pornography Victims Reserve.

(Sec. 6) In a criminal proceeding, a victim of a child pornography offense must have access to the pornographic material depicting the victim for inspection, viewing, and examination by the victim, his or her attorney, and potential expert witnesses.