There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Underrides Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reduce the number of preventable deaths and injuries caused by underride crashes, to improve motor carrier and passenger motor vehicle safety, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
12/12/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 12/12/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 12/12/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 12/13/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/14/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/18/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 01/29/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2219. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/12/2017)

Stop Underrides Act of 2017

This bill amends federal transportation law to require the Department of Transportation (DOT) to issue a final rule to require the installation of rear underride guards that meet a specified performance standard on all trailers, semi-trailers, and single unit trucks with a gross vehicle weight rating of more than 10,000 pounds that are manufactured on or after the effective date of the rule.

DOT shall issue a final rule requiring the installation of side underride guards that meet a specified performance standard on all trailers, semi-trailers, and single unit trucks with a gross vehicle rating of more than 10,000 pounds manufactured on or after the effective date of the rule.

DOT shall issue a final rule requiring all commercial motor vehicles with a gross vehicle weight rating of more than 10,000 pounds manufactured on or after the effective date of the rule to be equipped with front underride guards. It shall complete research on equipping commercial motor vehicles with a gross weight rating of more than 10,000 pounds with a front underride guard to prevent trucks from overriding the passenger vehicle and submit to the congressional transportation committees a report on such research.

The bill sets forth provisions regarding retrofit and maintenance requirements, and requires post-accident inspections and pre-trip inspections by drivers.