There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the health care center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Tallahassee, Florida, as the Sergeant Ernest I. "Boots" Thomas VA Clinic, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/25/2018Became Public Law No: 115-193. (TXT | PDF)
06/25/2018Signed by President.
06/14/2018Presented to President.
06/07/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H4964)
06/07/2018Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
02/14/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1130)
02/14/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1130)
12/19/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/25/2018Became Public Law No: 115-193. (TXT | PDF)
06/25/2018Signed by President.
06/14/2018SenatePresented to President.
06/07/2018-9:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2018-9:53pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4964)
06/07/2018-9:52pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4964)
06/07/2018-9:52pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
06/07/2018HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
02/16/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/16/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/16/2018-9:03amHouseReceived in the House.
02/15/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/14/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1130)
02/14/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1130)
12/19/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 12/19/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/19/2017 Referred to
02/14/2018 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs06/07/2018 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/16/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2246. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-193 (06/25/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs health care center located at 2181 Orange Avenue in Tallahassee, Florida, as the "Sergeant Ernest I. `Boots' Thomas VA Clinic."