There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans Benefits and Transition Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Benefits and Transition Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide certain burial benefits for spouses and children of veterans who are buried in tribal cemeteries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-407. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2248 by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7896)
12/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9794-9798)
03/01/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1321)
03/01/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1321)
12/19/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-407. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2248 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7896)
12/11/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
12/10/2018-5:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2018-5:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9794-9798)
12/10/2018-4:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2248.
12/10/2018-4:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9794-9802)
12/10/2018-4:56pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/05/2018-4:51pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/05/2018-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/05/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/01/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1321)
03/01/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1321)
12/19/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 12/19/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 12/19/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/19/2017 Referred to
03/01/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2248. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-407 (12/31/2018)

Veterans Benefits and Transition Act of 2018

This bill updates various Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) benefits and programs in areas including education, transition assistance, and civil relief.

The bill makes a number of changes to educational benefits. Among the changes, the bill adjusts assistance limits for veterans participating in a VA vocational rehabilitation program who are called to active reserve duty in certain instances. The bill also requires the VA to electronically provide documentation verifying the amount of their housing stipend to recipients of Post-9/11 educational assistance and requires the VA to disapprove courses of education at educational institutions that have certain payment policies in place.

Additionally, the bill requires the VA to make prompt payments of educational assistance funding and to provide information on whether a postsecondary education institution requires a covered individual to take certain actions to stay enrolled pending a receipt of educational assistance. Finally, the bill updates the basic housing allowance amounts for veterans enrolled in high technology programs pursuant to the VA pilot program.

The bill makes changes regarding memorial affairs for veterans, including requiring the VA to furnish, when requested, headstones or markers for the unmarked graves of any eligible individuals (including those whose remains are unavailable) buried in a veterans cemetery owned by a tribal organization or on land owned by or held in trust for a tribal organization.

The bill amends several sections of the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, including to allow (1) a surviving spouse of a deceased servicemember who died while in military service to terminate a lease without penalty within one year of the servicemember's death; (2) the spouse of a servicemember to elect to use the same residence as the servicemember for the purposes of taxation and voting; and (3) a servicemember to terminate a commercial mobile, telephone exchange, internet access or programming service contract after the service member receives military orders to a location that does not support such contracts.

With regard to transition assistance, the bill requires the VA to identify and publish a list of community-based programs operated by nonprofit entities that provide transition assistance to members of the Armed Forces who are retired, separated, or discharged.

The bill addresses a variety of VA administrative issues. Specifically, the bill directs the VA to prohibit employees who have knowingly misused VA purchase cards from serving as purchase card holders or approving officials. The bill also requires the VA to make changes to its information technology systems so that changes to information about a person's dependent is reviewable and revisable by that person.

Under the bill, the VA must submit certain documents to Congress related to the Electronic Health Record Modernization Program. In addition, the VA must develop a standard letter to be provided to individuals who owe debts to the VA and to develop a method by which individuals can elect to receive such notice electronically.

The bill also makes several other changes to a variety of VA programs, projects, and benefits. Specifically, the bill authorizes specific major medical facility projects and requires VA medical facility directors to submit plans to improve facilities.

The bill expands eligibility for homeless veterans reintegration programs to other veterans, including include veterans who are transitioning from being incarcerated and others.

The VA must award contracts to multiple regional prime vendors instead of a single nationwide prime vendor for the Medical Surgical Prime Vendor program; and

Finally, the bill requires the VA to report on the feasibility and advisability of expanding access to dental care for eligible veterans.